CA AB903 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42357.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: compostable plastic bags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 903 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 903 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | From Senate committee without further action. | |
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-08-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-25 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 1734.) | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 13). | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 20). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |