CA AB901 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1939.09, 1939.19, and 1939.31 of the Civil Code, relating to rental passenger vehicle transactions.
Title
Rental passenger vehicle transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 901 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB901 Calderon By Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 901 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB901 Calderon By Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 901 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 415, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 2975.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2530.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 1717.) (June 29). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1287.) |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1939.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1939.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1939.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |