CA AB895 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1569.885 and 1599.75 of, and to add Section 1422.65 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to long-term health care facilities.
Title
Skilled nursing facilities, intermediate care facilities, and residential care facilities for the elderly: notice to prospective residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 895 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB895 Holden By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 895 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB895 Holden By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 895 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5048.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3410.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 11). |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1422.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1599.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |