CA AB893 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1939.01 of, and to add Sections 1939.38 and 1939.39 to, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 13995.65.5 of, and to add Section 50474.20 to, the Government Code, relating to rental passenger vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal vehicle sharing programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-08 - Assembly - AB 893 Papan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB893 Papan By Umberg (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 893 Papan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-14 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2023-09-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 3125.).
2023-09-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
2023-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2398.).
2023-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-28SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2023-08-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-08-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2023-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2023-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E. D.
2023-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 1917.)
2023-05-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1684.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2023-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2023-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2023-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2023-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1939.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1939.38New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1939.39New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13995.65.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code50474.20New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#92ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893#91CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB893

Bill Comments

feedback