CA AB893 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 399.35 to, and to add and repeal Section 400.5 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 893 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-28SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 5895.)
2018-08-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-05-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-07-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-05SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-14SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 1615.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2401.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code127805New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code399.35New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code400.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback