CA AB890 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65867.5 of, and to add Sections 65363 and 65850.10 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: planning and zoning: initiatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 890 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB890 Medina et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 890 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 3249.).
2017-09-12AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (September 12).
2017-09-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2514.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-28SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-08-28SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-28SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 19).
2017-07-12SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR.
2017-06-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-21SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and E. & C.A.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 32. Page 2067.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
2017-05-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-04-18AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 5).
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E. & R. and NAT. RES.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code9105Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9108Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9110Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9116Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9117New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9118Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9203Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9207Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9208Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9214Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9215Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9219New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9227New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9301Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9305Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9310Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9311Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9312Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9318New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65363New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65850.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65867.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21065Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21152Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback