CA AB89 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1031.4 to the Government Code, and to add Section 13511.1 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: minimum qualifications.
Sponsors
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 89 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Portantino (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 89 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Portantino (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 89 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 3145.). |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 2617.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 13. Page 1890.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 1031.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13511.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |