CA AB89 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4418.25, 4474.2, 4519.5, 4648, 4785, 4801, 6500, and 6509 of, to add Sections 4519.6, 4659.1, and 4806 to, and to add and repeal Section 4648.01 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Assembly - AB 89 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 89 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 89 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2001.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2001.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 2004.). |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1364.). |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 1337.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1396.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4418.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4474.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4519.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.01 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4659.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4785 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4806 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |