CA AB89 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 30130.5) to Chapter 2 of Part 13 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Taxation: cigarettes and other tobacco products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-04-30 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-23 | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and REV. & TAX. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and G.O. | |
2009-01-06 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. | |
2009-01-05 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30130.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_89&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_89_bill_20090105_introduced.html |