CA AB888 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11158.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Opioid prescriptions: information: nonpharmacological treatments for pain.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 888 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1575.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11158.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |