CA AB887 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-15 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-15 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8590.7 of the Government Code, relating to human trafficking, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Human trafficking victims assistance: grants.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 887 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 887 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 6. Page 1264.) |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 18). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3309.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8590.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |