CA AB887 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8590.7 of the Government Code, relating to human trafficking, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking victims assistance: grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 887 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-25SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-06-21SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-06-21SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-06SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-08-21SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-14SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2017-04-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 6. Page 1264.)
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 18).
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3303Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code3309.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8590.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback