CA AB881 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41821.5 of, and to add Section 41781.4 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Recycling: plastic waste: export.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 881 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB881 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 881 Lorena Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB881 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 881 Lorena Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2620.). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2092.). |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1693.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1470.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 41781.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 41821.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |