CA AB881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 65852.2 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB881 Bloom By Wieckowski (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 881 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 881 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 881 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 881 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3563.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 2925.). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 1618.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |