CA AB874 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26050, 26060, and 26061 of, and to add Article 2.1 (commencing with Section 26065) to Chapter 4 of Division 16 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to the Property Assessed Clean Energy program.
Title
PACE program: risk mitigation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26065 | New Code | See Bill Text |