CA AB870 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25365.6 of, and to add Section 25365.8 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials: liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to com. on JUD.) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3242.) |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25365.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25365.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |