CA AB869 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11011 of the Government Code, relating to state property.
Title
Surplus state property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 869 Cunningham Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB869 Cunningham By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 869 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB869 Cunningham By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 869 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-08 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3304.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2702.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |