CA AB865 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170.91 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Military personnel: veterans: resentencing: mitigating circumstances.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 865 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB865 Levine By Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 865 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB865 Levine By Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 865 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6610.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5569.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3856.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 19. Page 3760.) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |