CA AB864 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 84305, 84501, 84502, 84503, 84504.2, 84504.3, 84504.4, 84504.5, 84504.6, 84511, and 85704 of, and to repeal Section 84503.5 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 864 Mullin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Noes (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB864 Mullin By Hill (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 864 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Noes (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB864 Mullin By Hill (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 864 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3517.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 2853.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84503.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |