CA AB864 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 51013.1 to the Government Code, relating to oil spill response.
Title
Oil spill response: environmentally and ecologically sensitive areas.
Sponsors
Asm. Das Williams [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 864 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BURKE (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB864 Williams By Jackson (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 864 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB864 Williams By Jackson (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 864 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3203.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2684.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1477.) |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 29). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 13). |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51013.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8670.28.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 44002.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |