CA AB861 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 798.23 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehome parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobilehome parks: rental restrictions: management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 861 BENNETT Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB861 Bennett By Umberg (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 861 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 21.).
2021-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.).
2021-09-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-06-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 15).
2021-06-04SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 20. Page 1366.)
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 3).
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2021-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code798.23Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB861

Bill Comments

feedback