CA AB861 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 329 and 331 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 861 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 861 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2106.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 329 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |