CA AB861 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 29321 of, and to add Section 29322 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to bees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Africanized honey bees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 861 DAHLE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB861 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 861 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2567.).
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2023.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1617.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code29320Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code29321Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code29322New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback