CA AB860 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5845.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Services Oversight and Accountability Commission: factfinding tour.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB860 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 860 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11 Stricken from file.
2017-08-21 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2017-07-31 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-07-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2023.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1489.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and G.O.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5845.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback