CA AB860 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 243.4, 261, 286, 288a, and 289 of the Penal Code, relating to sex crimes.
Title
Sex crimes: professional services.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 860 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 860 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1109.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 243.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 286 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 289 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 422.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |