CA AB86 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.3 (commencing with Section 12095) to Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Homelessness: Statewide Homelessness Coordinator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 86 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 86 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1964.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12095 | New Code | See Bill Text |