CA AB859 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15657 of, and to add Section 15657.02 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to elders and dependent adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elders and dependent adults: abuse or neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 859 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB859 Eggman By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB859 Eggman By Mitchell Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB859 Eggman By Mitchell (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 859 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-12 Stricken from file.
2018-01-03 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2017-10-02 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 41. Noes 21. Page 3336.).
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2523.).
2017-09-06SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2523.)
2017-09-06SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Mitchell.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-28SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-28SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 17. Page 2087.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15657Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15657.02New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback