CA AB854 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7060.8 to the Government Code, relating to residential real property.
Title
Residential real property: withdrawal of accommodations.
Sponsors
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] |
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3396.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20). |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (January 12). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7060.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |