CA AB854 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 781, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 781, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42920.5, 42921, 42923, and 42924 of, to add Section 42926 to, to repeal Section 42922 of, and to repeal and add Sections 42920 and 42925 of, the Education Code, relating to educational services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Educational services: pupils in foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 854 WEBER Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB854 Weber By Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 854 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB854 Weber By Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 854 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 781, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 854.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2611.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1756.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42920.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42921.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 42922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42923 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42926 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 42927 | New Code | See Bill Text |