CA AB853 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 69981 and 69986 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: Golden State Scholarshare Trust Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Christy Smith [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB853 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 853 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 853 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1077.) |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69981 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69986 | Amended Code | Citation Text |