CA AB852 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17.3 to the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Sentencing: bias.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Assembly - AB 852 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 1544.) |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 17.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |