CA AB852 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22454 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: child safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 852 GRAYSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-26SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H., ED., and JUD.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1392.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65400Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25210Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25210.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code22454Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback