CA AB851 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50077, 56658, 56885.5, 56886, and 57405 of, to add Sections 56045.5, 56653.1, 56770, 56804, 56813, 56814, 56816, 57401, and 57426 to, and to repeal Sections 57402, 57404, 57409, 57410, 57416, 57423, and 57424 of, the Government Code, and to amend Section 99 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: organization: disincorporations.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Sen. John Moorlach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Assembly - (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB851 Mayes By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB851 Mayes By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2676.). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2202.). |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2015-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1550.) |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |