CA AB850 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 37420.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City property: sale of water utility property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 850 Gallagher Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB850 Gallagher et al. By Archuleta (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 850 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-18SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2021-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-03-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and L. GOV.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2021-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code37420.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback