CA AB85 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17600.10, 17600.15, 17600.20, 17601.25, 17603, 17604, and 17606.10, to amend, repeal, and add Section 17600 of, to add Sections 11450.025, 14301.5 17600.50, 17600.60, 17601.50, 17601.75, and 17609.02 to, to add a heading to Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 17601.25) of Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 9 of, and to add Article 6.6 (commencing with Section 14199.1) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, and Article 11 (commencing with Section 17610), Article 12 (commencing with Section 17612.1), and Article 13 (commencing with Section 17613.1) to Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health and human services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-15 - Assembly - AB 85 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB85 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 85 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2013.
2013-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2013-06-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2013-06-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2045.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2045.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 2046.).
2013-06-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1384.).
2013-06-14SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 1361.) Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.)
2013-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-05-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-05-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1395.)
2013-05-09AssemblyWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.)
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2013-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_85&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130110_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130613_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130628_enrolled.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130627_chaptered.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130628_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130627_chaptered.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130110_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130613_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130628_enrolled.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_bill_20130618_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_vote_20130513_0113PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_vote_20130615_1157AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_85_vote_20130615_1224PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback