CA AB846 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 18716) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary contributions: California YMCA Youth and Government Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB846 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 846 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2070.).
2017-07-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2017-06-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1657.)
2017-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2017-03-27AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code18716Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback