CA AB845 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2196.9 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing education: physicians and surgeons: maternal mental health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 845 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2135.).
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.)
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 26).
2019-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2196.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2811.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback