CA AB841 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 25216.9 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission: Industrial Heat Electrification Roadmap.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 841 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 841 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1918.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25216.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |