CA AB836 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 18940.7 and 18940.8 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 13558 and 13558.1 of the Water Code, relating to building standards.
Title
California Building Standards Commission: recycled water: nonpotable water systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18940.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18940.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13558 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13558.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |