CA AB835 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 120991 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to HIV testing.
Title
Hospital emergency departments: HIV testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 835 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 835 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 7). |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 1770.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120991 | Amended Code | Citation Text |