CA AB834 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 2.1 (commencing with Section 115917) to Chapter 5 of Part 10 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 13182 to the Water Code, relating to water quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe recreational water use: standards: Freshwater and Estuarine Harmful Algal Bloom Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 834 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1981.)
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code115917New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13182New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback