CA AB829 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 50204 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: funding: state-assisted projects.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 829 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB829 Chiu By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 829 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB829 Chiu By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 829 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6874.). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5661.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1617.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50204 | New Code | See Bill Text |