CA AB828 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 10721, 10726.4, 10730.2, 10733, 10735.2, and 10735.8 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sustainable groundwater management: managed wetlands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2023-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-03-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2023-03-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2023-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2023-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code10721Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10726.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10730.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10733Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10735.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10735.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback