CA AB826 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 15.5 (commencing with Section 18996.5) to Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergency food assistance: COVID-19.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] |
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 826 Santiago Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB826 Santiago et al. By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 826 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB826 Santiago et al. By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 826 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5478.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5409.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-07-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1816.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18996.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |