CA AB815 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 41825 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Integrated waste management plans: source reduction and recycling element and household hazardous waste element: dual stream recycling programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 815 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB815 Aguiar-Curry By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 815 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2720.).
2019-08-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2140.).
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8).
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-10AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code41825Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback