CA AB814 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4905 of, to add Sections 2631 and 2660.9 to, and to add and repeal Section 4828.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Veterinary medicine: animal physical rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 814 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 2071.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 25). |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2631 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2660.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4828.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |