CA AB813 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 8390) to Division 4.1 of, to repeal Section 352 of, to repeal and add Section 359 of, and to repeal Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 359.5) of Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Multistate regional transmission system organization: membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 813 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-16Senate(Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5341.)
2018-08-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-16SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-05-17SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
2018-03-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-31SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2072.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66010.91Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code89001Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code89002Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code89002.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code89754Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code334Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code335Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code336Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code337Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code338Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code339Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code340Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code341Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code341.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code341.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code341.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code341.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code341.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code347Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code348Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code349Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code352Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code359Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code359.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code399.23New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8390New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback