CA AB812 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 249, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 249, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8257, 8402, 8403, 8406.6, 8406.7, 8406.9, 8407, and 8408 of, and to add Section 8401.5 to, the Education Code, relating to child care.
Title
Child care: contracts: termination and suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Assembly - AB 812 MITCHELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB812 Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 812 MITCHELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB812 Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 812 MITCHELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 249, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2585.). |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1844.). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1761.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8401.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8406.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8406.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8406.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8407 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |