CA AB811 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 130242 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority: contracting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 811 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB811 Luz Rivas et al. By Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 811 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-31SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 1722.) (June 29).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1.)
2021-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-03AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-05-03AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code130242Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback