CA AB811 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 362.05 and 727 of, and to add Sections 224.75, 851.1, and 889.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: rights: computing technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 811 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB811 Gipson By Mitchell (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 811 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 3361.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2780.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1).
2017-08-28SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 1990.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25).
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback